Beshara, Hani Moheeb Nasseem (CPSO#: 83370)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Alexandria, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Milton District Hospital
725 Bronte Street South
Milton ON  L9T 9K1
Phone: (905) 878-2383 Ext. 7604
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

6521 Derry Road, Suite 8
Milton ON  L9T 7W1
Canada
Phone: (905) 876-0002
Fax: (905) 876-0003
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Hani Beshara Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 29 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Beshara ( CPSO# 83370 )

Business Address:
Milton District Hospital
7030 Derry Road East
Milton ON  L9T 7H6
Phone Number: (905) 878-2383

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Milton Site Halton Healthcare Services Milton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist
Critical Care Medicine Effective: 27 Sep 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HANI MOHEEB NASSEEM BESHARA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BESHARA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 22 Sep 2005
Assessment Verification Period - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2009