Beshara, Nasser Roshdy (CPSO#: 72540)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:Ain Shams University, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 202A
139 Greenbank Road
Ottawa ON  K2H 9A5
Phone: (613) 721-7111
Fax: (613) 721-3667
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Queensway Carlton Hospital
3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa ON  K2H 8P4
Canada
Phone: (613) 721-2000
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Nasser Beshara Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 19 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Beshara ( CPSO# 72540 )

Business Address:
202A - 139 Greenbank Road
Ottawa ON  K2H 9A5
Phone Number: (613) 721-7111

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NASSER ROSHDY BESHARA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BESHARA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Aug 2002
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 07 Feb 2017
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 2017