Beshay, Ezzat Mahrouss Youssef (CPSO#: 108801)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2016

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:South Valley University Sohag Fac of Med, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 3
246 Dundas St South
Cambridge ON  N1R 8A8
Phone: (519) 267-7388
Fax: 844 453-3558
Electoral District: 03
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

344 Kerr St
Oakville ON  L6K 3B8
Canada
Phone: (905) 845-8000
Fax: (905) 845-8002
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2018 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. EZZAT MAHROUSS YOUSSEF BESHAY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BESHAY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 22 Sep 2016
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2016
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2018