Beshay, Hany Youssef Tawfeek (CPSO#: 80491)

Current Status: Active Member as of 19 Feb 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Feb 2004

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Alexandria, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Terry Fox Medical
Unit 10
5380 Terry Fox Way
Mississauga ON  L5V 0A5
Phone: (905) 858-3030
Fax: (905) 858-3031
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: H. Y. Beshay Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 27 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Beshay ( CPSO# 80491 )

Business Address:
Terry Fox Medical
Unit 10
5380 Terry Fox Way
Mississauga ON  L5V 0A5
Phone Number: (905) 858-3030

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Egypt
Yukon

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 03 Dec 2003 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HANY YOUSSEF TAWFEEK BESHAY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BESHAY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Palliative Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Feb 2004

Previous Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 14 Jul 2009
Summary:

 On July 14, 2009, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Beshay committed an act of professional 
 misconduct, in that he engaged in an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, 
 having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, 
 dishonourable or unprofessional.

Dr. Beshay received his medical degree in Egypt in 1986, and 
 thereafter practised medicine in Egypt until 1996, at which time he moved to Ontario. Between 
 November 1996 and June 2001, Dr. Beshay did not practise medicine, except for one period in 1998 
 when he maintains he practised in Egypt. In 2001, Dr. Beshay obtained a licence to practise 
 medicine in the Yukon. In 2004, Dr. Beshay was granted a certificate of registration from the 
 CPSO. Dr. Beshay admitted that the information he supplied to the CPSO and the Yukon Medical 
 Council was in error, in that it failed to disclose interruptions in practice after he came to 
 Canada in 1996. 

The Discipline Committee ordered and directed that:

1.  Dr. Beshay appear 
 before the panel to be reprimanded.

2.  Dr. Beshay pay to the College costs in the amount of 
 $3,650 within 30 days of the date of the Order.

3.  The results of this proceeding be included in 
 the register.

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): July 14, 2009