Besir, Mirjana (CPSO#: 58122)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jul 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Serbian

Education:University of Belgrade, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 480
700 Lawrence Avenue West
Toronto ON  M6A 3B4
Phone: (416) 789-7957 Ext. 3211
Fax: (416) 789-9079
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Suite 250-A
1560 Yonge street
Toronto ON  M4T 2S9
Canada
Phone: (416) 854-9909
Fax: (416) 481-6514
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

1235 Willson ave
5th floor
Toronto ON  M3M 0B2
Canada
Phone: 416242 1000 Ext. 43171
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M. Besir Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 10 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Besir ( CPSO# 58122 )

Business Address:
Suite 480
700 Lawrence Avenue West
Toronto ON  M6A 3B4
Phone Number: (416) 789-7957

Business Address:
Suite 250-A
1560 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M4T 2S9
Phone Number: (416) 854-9909

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 07 Jun 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MIRJANA BESIR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BESIR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 31 Dec 1991
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jul 1991