Bessette, Benoit Jean (CPSO#: 76835)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 Jul 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Jul 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 202
595 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 4L2
Phone: (613) 746-6745
Fax: (613) 746-6008
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Montfort Hospital
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T2
Canada
Phone: (613) 746-4621
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Carleton University Sport Medicine
Ice House 1125 Colonel By Drive
Ottawa ON  K1S 5B6
Canada
Phone: (613) 520-3510
Fax: (613) 520-3974
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Bessette Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 26 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Bessette ( CPSO# 76835 )

Business Address:
713 Montreal Raod
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T2
Phone Number: (613) 746-4621

Business Address:
1125 Colonel By Drive
Ottawa ON  K1S 5B6
Phone Number: (613) 520-3510

Business Address:
Suite 202
595 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 4L2
Phone Number: (613) 746-6745

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Montfort Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BENOIT JEAN BESSETTE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BESSETTE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 2001