Bestawros, Alain (CPSO#: 89496)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Alain Bestawros Medicine Professional Corporation/Alain Bestawros Medecine Societe Professionnelle

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Nov 29 2013

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 07 May 2008 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective: 16 Sep 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2008
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2014