Bettolli, Marcos (CPSO#: 81834)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 05 Jul 2007

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:Universidad Catolica de Cordoba, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ont
Division of General Surgery
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone: (613) 737-7600 Ext. 2878
Fax: (613) 738-4849
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Bettolli Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 18 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Bettolli ( CPSO# 81834 )

Business Address:
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
Division of General Surgery
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone Number: (613) 737-7600

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 05 Jul 2007 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Sep 2004 to 28 Sep 2004
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Pediatric General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 29 Sep 2004 to 31 Aug 2005
Clinical Fellow - Pediatric General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Sep 2005 to 31 Aug 2006
Clinical Fellow - Pediatric General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Sep 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Pediatric General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 29 Sep 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 05 Jul 2007
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 09 Mar 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 24 Apr 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 17 Nov 2014
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 17 Nov 2014

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 17 Nov 2014 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Marcos Bettolli may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in  a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Surgery,
                        University  of  Ottawa,  in  which  Dr.  Bettolli holds an academic
                        appointment at the rank of Associate Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration automatically expires  when  Dr. Bettolli
                  no longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.