Betts, Martin Edward (CPSO#: 88774)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jun 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Scarborough and Rouge Hospital
General Site
Critical Care Unit
3050 Lawerence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1P 2V5
Phone: (416) 438-2911
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Sault Area Hospital
750 Great Northern Road
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6B 0A8
Canada
Phone: (705) 759-3434
County: Territorial District of Algoma
Electoral District: 08

Centre for Sleep and Chronobiology
295 College Street, Suite 301
Toronto ON  M5T 1S2
Canada
Phone: (416) 603-9531
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Cobourg Sleep Clinic
197 Third Street
Cobourg ON  K9A 3L5
Canada
Phone: 905-373-1227
Fax: 905-373-4062
County: County of Northumberland
Electoral District: 06

Scarborough and Rouge Hospital
Centenary Site
Intensive Care Unit
2867 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough ON  M1E 4B9
Canada
Phone: (416) 284-8131
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Sleep and Snoring Institute
900 The East Mall
Etobicoke ON  M9B 6K2
Canada
Phone: (416) 695-0480
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Scarborough and Rouge Hospital
Birchmount Site
Intensive Care Unit
3030 Birchmount Road
Scarborough ON  M1W 3W3
Canada
Phone: 4164952626
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Martin Betts Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 02 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Betts ( CPSO# 88774 )

Business Address:
301 - 295 College Street
Toronto ON  M5T 1S2

Business Address:
3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1P 2V5
Phone Number: (416) 438-2911

Business Address:
3030 Birchmount Road
Scarborough ON  M1W 3W3
Phone Number: (416) 495-2400

Business Address:
2867 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough ON  M1E 4B9

Business Address:
197 Third Street
Cobourg ON  K9A 3L5

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Rouge Valley Centenary Health Centre,Toronto Toronto
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste Marie
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto
Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount Campus Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist
Critical Care Medicine Effective: 29 Sep 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARTIN EDWARD BETTS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BETTS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Sep 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 15 Sep 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2012