Bezu, Kesete Tsegay (CPSO#: 85206)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Jul 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Amharic, English, Tigrigna

Education:Jimma University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 8
700 Markham Road
Scarborough ON  M1H 2A7
Phone: (416) 264-3443
Fax: (416) 264-3446
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

TORONTO EAST GENERAL HOSPITAL
825 COXWELL AVENUE
Toronto ON  M4C 3E7
Canada
Phone: (416) 461-8272
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: K. Bezu Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 11 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Bezu ( CPSO# 85206 )

Business Address:
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 3E7
Phone Number: (416) 461-8272

Business Address:
Unit 8
700 Markham Road
Scarborough ON  M1H 2A7
Phone Number: (416) 264-3443

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KESETE TSEGAY BEZU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BEZU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 2010