Bhaduri, Mousumi Samar (CPSO#: 83044)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 01 Jul 2010

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Bengali, English, Hindi, Marathi

Education:University of Pune, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
LHSC Victoria Hospital
Department of Medical Imaging
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 685-8500 Ext. 55341
Electoral District: 02
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

St.Joseph's hospital
268 Grosvenor St. London, Ontario
London ON  N6A 4V2
Canada
Phone: (519) 646-6100
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Mousumi Bhaduri Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 10 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Bhaduri ( CPSO# 83044 )

Business Address:
Victoria Hospital
London Health Sciences Centre
Department of Radiology
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre South Street Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,Children's Hospital of Western Ontario London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London
Woodstock General Hospital Woodstock

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 01 Jul 2017 CPSO Recognized Specialist
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 01 Jul 2010 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 22 Sep 2005
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 31 Dec 2007
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2017

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2017 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Mousumi Samar Bhaduri may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Medical
                        Imaging, Division of Radiology, University of Western Ontario, in
                        which Dr. Bhaduri holds an academic appointment at the rank of
                        Associate Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of her appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration automatically expires when Dr. Bhaduri no
                  longer holds the appointment referred to in clause 1.