Bhagavatula, Subramanya Sastry (CPSO#: 78733)

Current Status: Active Member as of 23 Apr 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Apr 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Bengali, English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Telugu, Urdu

Education:University of Delhi, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Health Sciences North
Department of Psychiatry
680 Kirkwood Drive
Sudbury ON  P3E 1X3
Phone: (705) 675-5900 Ext. 8234
Fax: (705) 671-3031
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Bhagavatula Sastry Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 21 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Bhagavatula ( CPSO# 78733 )

Business Address:
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Phone Number: (705) 523-7100

Business Address:
Sudbury Regional Hospital
Department of Psychiatry
680 Kirkwood Drive
Sudbury ON  P3E 1X3
Phone Number: (705) 675-5900

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Health Sciences North Sudbury

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 15 Oct 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SUBRAMANYA SASTRY BHAGAVATULA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BHAGAVATULA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 31 Dec 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
International Specialist Physician - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 13 Jul 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 14 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 31 Dec 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 28 Sep 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 23 Apr 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Apr 2009