Bhalla, Dinesh (CPSO#: 71896)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 08 May 1998

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 08 May 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Delhi, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 15 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 19 Aug 1997 to 03 Oct 1997
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 13 Apr 1998 to 08 May 1998
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Aug 1997
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 03 Oct 1997
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Apr 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 08 May 1998