Bhalla, Indu Bala (CPSO#: 28055)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:University of Delhi, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Docudavit 28 Eugene St Toronto, ON M6B 3Z4 Phone: 1-888-781-9083
Date Received: 30 May 2018


Address: Written requests for medical records for patients seen at the Med Care Parkways West Clinic, formerly located on Central Parkway West in Mississauga, should be sent to: MCI Medical Clinics Suite 200 160 Eglinton Avenue East Toronto, ON M4P 3B5
Date Received: 15 Jan 2008

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1973
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Feb 1976
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2018