Bhalla, Rashmi (CPSO#: 82403)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hyde Park Medical & Walk-In Clinic
4-640 Hyde Park Road
London ON  N6H 3S1
Phone: (519) 641-3627
Fax: (519) 641-3628
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Bhalla Rai Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 11 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Bhalla ( CPSO# 82403 )
Dr. S. Rai ( CPSO# 84749 )

Business Address:
4 - 640 Hyde Park Road
London ON  N6H 3S1
Phone Number: (519) 641-3627

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 2007 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RASHMI BHALLA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BHALLA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2007