Bhalla, Sunil (CPSO#: 94187)

Current Status: Active Member as of 10 Jul 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Jul 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Sint Eustatius, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
North Toronto sleep Centre
108-4040 finch avenue
Scarborough ON  M1S 4V5
Phone: 4162933233
Fax: 4162930692
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Etobicoke Brampton Sleep Clinic
106 Humber College Blvd
Etobicoke ON  M9V 4E4
Canada
Phone: (416) 742-0680
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Glazier Medical Centre
11 Gibb St
Oshawa ON  L1H 2J9
Canada
Phone: 9055791212
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Sunil Bhalla Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 05 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Bhalla ( CPSO# 94187 )

Business Address:
North Toronto Sleep Centre
Suite 108
4040 Finch Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1S 4V5
Phone Number: (416) 293-3233

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist
Nephrology Effective: 23 Sep 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SUNIL BHALLA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BHALLA is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 09 Jul 2010
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 09 Jul 2010
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 03 Aug 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 2014