Bhandari, Rakesh (CPSO#: 52324)

Current Status: Active Member as of 26 Jan 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jan 1987

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, German, Hindi

Education:Indore University, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
10 - 14 Lisa St
Brampton ON  L6T 4W2
Phone: (905) 452-7111
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Strathroy Middlesex general hospita
395 Carrie street
Strathroy ON  N7G3J4
Canada
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02

104-551 Oxford street west
Alba Dental Center
London ON  N6H 0H9
Canada
Phone: 519-777-2020
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02

Lambton shores family dental
85 King Street
Forest ON  N0N1J0
Canada
Phone: 519-7041400
County: County of Lambton
Electoral District: 01

Heritage dental center
368 Baldoon Road
Chatham ON  N7L0C1
Canada
Phone: 519-3546004
County: County of Kent
Electoral District: 01

Light house dental
185 Grand Ave west
Chatham ON  N7L1C2
Canada
Phone: 519-3542929
County: County of Kent
Electoral District: 01

Advanced surgical operatory
230 Victoria street
London ON  N6A2C2
Canada
Phone: 519-8731700
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02

Bright view dental
11 Metcalf street West
Strathroy ON  N7G1M7
Canada
Phone: 519-2452020
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02

Nortland Dental centre
Unit C4 1295 Highbury Ave.
London ON  N5Y5L3
Canada
Phone: 519-4552551
Fax: 519-4559111
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02

301 Oxford st w.
Cumberland Laser clinic
London ON  N6H 1S5
Canada
Phone: (519) 432-7546
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02

Dental office
14 Lisa street
Brampton ON  L6T 4W2
Canada
Phone: (519) 452-7111
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Lambton Family Dental
387 Exmouth Street
Sarnia ON  N7T 5N8
Canada
Phone: (226) 313-2185
County: County of Lambton
Electoral District: 01

London Scoping center
310 Wellington Road
London ON  N6C4P4
Canada
Phone: 519-433-4700
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02

Riverview family dentistry
Corunna ON  N0N 1G0
Canada
Phone: 519-813-9090
County: County of Lambton
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rakesh Bhandari Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 05 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Bhandari ( CPSO# 52324 )

Business Address:
310 Wellington Road
London ON  N6C 4P4

Business Address:
Axis Dental
14 Lisa Street
Brampton ON  L6T 4W2
Phone Number: (905) 452-7111

Business Address:
Riverview Dental
360 Lyndosh Street
Corunna ON  N0N 1G0
Phone Number: (519) 813-9090

Business Address:
Lambton Dental
387 Exmouth Street
Sarnia ON  N7T 5N8
Phone Number: (519) 344-5747

Business Address:
310 Oxford Street
London ON  N6H 1S5

Business Address:
395 Carrie Street
Strathroy ON  N7G 3J4

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 19 Nov 1986 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RAKESH BHANDARI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BHANDARI is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Apr 1983
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 1986
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jan 1987

Concerns

Source: Other
Active Date: June 11, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Criminal Charges:

Effective May 29, 2015, where a member has been charged with an offence under the Criminal Code of Canada or the Ontario Health Insurance Act and the charge is outstanding and is known to the College, the College By-laws require certain information about the charge to be posted on the register.

The following are outstanding charges against this member, as known to the College, together with the corresponding information:

(1) Mischief relating to property with a value under $5000 on or about January 7, 2018 at the Municipality of Middlesex Centre, contrary to Section 430(4) of the Criminal Code.

(2) Assault between January 1, 2012 and December 31, 2014 at the City of London, contrary to Section 266 of the Criminal Code.

(3) Assault with a weapon between January 1, 2017 and December 31, 2017 at the Municipality of Middlesex Centre, contrary to Section 267(a) of the Criminal Code.

(4) Knowingly utter a threat to cause death between December 1, 2017 and January 5, 2018 at the Municipality of Middlesex Centre, contrary to Section 264.1(1)(a) of the Criminal Code.

Date of charges: January 22, 2018
Place of charges: London, Ontario
Ontario Provincial Police


Source: Other
Active Date: June 11, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Effective December 4, 2014, the College By-laws require members to report to the College any currently existing conditions of release (“bail conditions”) following a charge for a criminal or provincial offence or subsequent to a finding of guilt and pending appeal. The following are conditions of release made against this member:

[January 8, 2018]

1. notify specified officer from Ontario Provincial Police of any change in his address, employment or occupation;

2. abstain from communicating directly or indirectly with XX or from going to specified address except in accordance with the following conditions: one time with an officer(s) from the Ontario Provincial Police;

3. abstain from possessing a firearm and to surrender to specified officer from Ontario Provincial Police any firearm in his possession and any authorization, licence or registration certificate or other document enabling the acquisition or possession of a firearm;

4. abstain from (i) the consumption of alcohol or other intoxicating substances, or, (ii) the consumption of drugs except in accordance with a medical prescription.