Bhanji, Rahima Amirali (CPSO#: 97384)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 24 Aug 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 24 Aug 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Alberta, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 26 Mar 2012 to 13 Apr 2012
Elective Trainee - Gastroenterology

The University of Western Ontario, 30 Jul 2012 to 24 Aug 2012
Elective Trainee - Hepatology/Liver Transplantation

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Mar 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 13 Apr 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 24 Aug 2012