Bhardwaj, Ajay Kumar (CPSO#: 97407)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Apr 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 17 Apr 2012

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Windsor University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Woodbridge Medical Centre
Unit A13
9600 Islington Avenue
Woodbridge ON  L4H 2T1
Phone: (905) 893-8085
Fax: (905) 893-8218
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ajay Bhardwaj Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 06 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Bhardwaj ( CPSO# 97407 )

Business Address:
Woodbridge Medical Centre
Unit A13
9600 Islington Avenue
Woodbridge ON  L4H 2T1
Phone Number: (905) 893-8085

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 17 Apr 2012
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 17 Apr 2012
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 16 Oct 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 27 Sep 2013
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 04 Oct 2013

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 27 Sep 2013 Active View Details [+]
            Dr. Ajay Kumar Bhardwaj may practise medicine independently in family medicine,
            only.