Bhargava, Reena (CPSO#: 73710)

Current Status: Active Member as of 31 Aug 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 31 Aug 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 510
330 Highway 7 East
Richmond Hill ON  L4B 3P8
Phone: 905 707 5007
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

726 upper james
Hamilton ON  L9C 2Z9
Canada
Phone: 905 575 5743
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Reena Bhargava Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 04 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Bhargava ( CPSO# 73710 )

Business Address:
726 Upper James
Hamilton ON  L9C 2Z9
Phone Number: (905) 575-5743

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. REENA BHARGAVA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BHARGAVA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Aug 2006