Bharwani, Sulaiman Shamsuddin (CPSO#: 73218)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 19 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 19 Jul 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Urdu

Education:University of Karachi, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1999 to 30 Jun 1999
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Jan 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 19 Jul 2008