Bhaskar, Atul Rajeshwar Singh (CPSO#: 75388)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Dec 2005

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Dec 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Bombay, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 15 Sep 2005 to 31 Dec 2005
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Sep 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2005