Bhat, Venkat (CPSO#: 113570)

Current Status: Active Member as of 21 Jul 2017

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Jul 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Rajiv Gandhi Univ of Health Sciences, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St. Michael's Hospital
193 Yonge Street
Suite 6-013
Toronto ON  M5B 1M8
Phone: 416-360-4000 Ext. 76404
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

University Health Network
Toronto Western Hospital
399 Bathurst Street
9MP-324B
Toronto ON  M5B 1M8
Canada
Phone: 416-603-5800 Ext. 6508
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 17 May 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. VENKAT BHAT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BHAT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 08 Aug 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jul 2017