Bhatia, Anuj (CPSO#: 87551)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Sep 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Sep 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi

Education:All-India Institute of Medical Sciences, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
UHN Toronto Western Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
Mcl 2 405
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone: (416) 603-5118
Fax: (416) 603-6494
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Bhatia Agarwal Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 02 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Agarwal ( CPSO# 87960 )
Dr. A. Bhatia ( CPSO# 87551 )

Business Address:
UHN Toronto Western Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
MCL 2- 405
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone Number: (416) 603-5118

Business Address:
Youthdale Treatment Centre
Department of Psychiatry
227 Victoria Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1T8
Phone Number: (416) 363-3751

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 08 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist
Pain Medicine Effective: 27 Sep 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANUJ BHATIA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BHATIA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 14 Sep 2007
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 15 Sep 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Apr 2010
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 07 Aug 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Sep 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Apr 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 May 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Sep 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2011