Bhatia, Sanjay (CPSO#: 91049)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Aug 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Aug 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:Christian Medical College, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 104
311 Commericial Street
Milton ON  L9T 3Z9
Phone: (905) 875-1300
Fax: (905) 875-0367
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S. Bhatia Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 07 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Bhatia ( CPSO# 91049 )

Business Address:
Suite 104
311 Commercial Street
Milton ON  L9T 3Z9
Phone Number: (905) 875-1300

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 01 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SANJAY BHATIA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BHATIA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 06 Dec 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 06 Dec 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 13 Jun 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 17 Aug 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Aug 2011