Bhatnagar, Gopal (CPSO#: 57129)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Aug 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
cleveland Clinic Abu Dhabi
Al Maryha island
8-C256
abu dhabi 1001
United Arab Emirates
Phone: 971508862720
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gopal Bhatnagar Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 27 2018

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

United Arab Emirates

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 12 Nov 1991 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiothoracic Surgery Effective: 31 Dec 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GOPAL BHATNAGAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BHATNAGAR is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Aug 1988