Bhatt, Mihir (CPSO#: 91706)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Sep 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Gujarati, Hindi

Education:McMaster University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
McMaster Children's Hospital
Department of Paediatrics
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 73464
Electoral District: 04

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 31 Aug 2013 RCPSC Specialist
Paediatric Haematology/Oncology Effective: 30 Nov 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MIHIR BHATT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BHATT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 31 Aug 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Sep 2011 to 31 Aug 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Sep 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Haematology/Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Aug 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Haematology/Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Sep 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Haematology/Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Nov 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Haematology/Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Dec 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 6 - Paediatric Haematology/Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Nov 2015
PostGrad Yr 6 - Paediatric Haematology/Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Sep 2013