Bhatti, Adil (CPSO#: 90766)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Urdu

Education:University of Toronto, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 205
2148 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K2A 1H1
Phone: (613) 596-0300
Fax: (613) 596-0848
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

The Ottawa Hospital
Riverside Campus
Eye Care Centre
1967 Riverside Drive
Ottawa ON  K1H 7W9
Canada
Phone: (613) 737-8899
Fax: 613-738-8394
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

The Ottawa Hospital General Campus
University of Ottawa Eye Institute
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Canada
Phone: (613) 737-8575
Fax: (613) 739-6291
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Bhatti Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 21 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Bhatti ( CPSO# 90766 )

Business Address:
Suite 205
2148 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K2A 1H1
Phone Number: (613) 596-0300

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ADIL BHATTI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BHATTI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Ophthalmology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Ophthalmology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Ophthalmology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Ophthalmology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Ophthalmology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2014