Bhavsar, Sankalp Virendrakumar (CPSO#: 94881)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Feb 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Marathi

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
672 Brant Sreet
Suite 407
Burlington ON  L7R 2H3
Phone: (905) 632-0607
Fax: (905) 632-8810
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Sankalp V. Bhavsar Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 17 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Bhavsar ( CPSO# 94881 )

Business Address:
Suite 407
672 Brant Street
Burlington ON  L7R 2H3
Phone Number: (905) 632-0607

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist
Rheumatology Effective: 29 Oct 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SANKALP VIRENDRAKUMAR BHAVSAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BHAVSAR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 14 Mar 2011 to 10 Apr 2011
Elective Trainee - Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 29 Aug 2011 to 16 Sep 2011
Elective Trainee - Rheumatology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Rheumatology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Rheumatology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Rheumatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Mar 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 10 Apr 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 29 Aug 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 16 Sep 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Feb 2014