Bhullar, Sundeep (CPSO#: 91928)

Current Status: Active Member as of 08 Jun 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Oakville Trafalgar Hospital
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 0L8
Phone: 9058452571
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Milton District Hospital
7030 Derry Rd, Milton, ON
Milton ON  L9T7H6
Canada
Phone: (905) 878-2383
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04

Joseph Brant Hospital
1230 North Shore Blvd E
Burlington ON  L7S 1W7
Canada
Phone: (905) 632-3737
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S. Bhullar Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 01 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Bhullar ( CPSO# 91928 )

Business Address:
725 Bronte Street South
Milton ON  L9T 9K1
Phone Number: (905) 878-2383

Business Address:
Oakville-Trafalgar Hospital
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 0L8
Phone Number: (905) 845-2571

Business Address:
1230 North Shore Boulevard East
Burlington ON  L7S 1W7

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington
Milton Site Halton Healthcare Services Milton
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 28 May 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SUNDEEP BHULLAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BHULLAR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Aug 2009 to 23 Oct 2009
Assessment Verification Period - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 24 Oct 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2010 to 24 Sep 2010
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 25 Sep 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2011 to 15 Jan 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 16 Jan 2012 to 20 May 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Oct 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Sep 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 20 May 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jun 2012