Bhyat, Rashaad (CPSO#: 83730)

Current Status: Active Member as of 18 Jan 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Jan 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:National University of Ireland, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Peel Memorial Family Medical Centre
169 Queen Street East
Suite 102
Brampton ON  L6V 1B3
Phone: 905-216-0663
Fax: 905-216-2865
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Unit # 2620
3320 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M4N 2M4
Canada
Phone: 647-749-9149
Fax: 416-238-8123
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Main Street Medical Center
Suite 9
10886 Hurontario Street
Brampton ON  L7A 3R9
Canada
Phone: (905) 846-9911
Fax: (905) 846-9299
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Bhyat Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 28 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Bhyat ( CPSO# 83730 )

Business Address:
Main Street Medical Center
Suite 9
10886 Hurontario Street
Brampton ON  L7A 3R9
Phone Number: (905) 846-9911

Business Address:
169 Queen Street East
Suite 102
Brampton ON  L6V 1B3
Phone Number: (905) 216-0663

Business Address:
Suite 2620
3320 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M4N 2M4

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 06 Dec 2006 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RASHAAD BHYAT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BHYAT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 27 Sep 2005 to 24 Oct 2005
Elective Trainee - Dermatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Sep 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 24 Oct 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jan 2007