Biancucci, Christina Marie (CPSO#: 86708)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Taddle Creek Family Health Team
P O Box 58/59
Suite 522
790 Bay Street
Toronto ON  M5G 1N8
Phone: (416) 591-1222
Fax: (416) 591-1227
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Christina M. Biancucci Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 22 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Biancucci ( CPSO# 86708 )

Business Address:
Taddle Creek Family Health Team
Suite 522
790 Bay Street
Toronto ON  M5G 1N8
Phone Number: (416) 591-1222

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 25 Jun 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHRISTINA MARIE BIANCUCCI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BIANCUCCI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2009