Bibeau, Marc Daniel (CPSO#: 80292)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2008

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Marc Bibeau Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 3 2008

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2005 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 12 Sep 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 31 Jul 2005
Elective Trainee - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Nov 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Nov 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jul 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Feb 2006
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2008