Bichai, Iman (CPSO#: 57967)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Aug 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Aug 2018

Summary

Former Name: Guirgis, Iman Bichai (used until: 08 Feb 1990 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English, French

Education:Ain Shams University, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
3812 Montego Dr
Huntington Beach CA  92649
United States
Phone: (949) 903-2601
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Scarborough Hospital
Grace Division
3030 Birchmount Road
Scarborough ON  M1W 3W3
Canada
Phone: (416) 495-2600
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Medical Records Location

Instructions: Requests to be sent to hospital where service was provided.
Date Received: 30 May 2018

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - California

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 06 Oct 2016 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 May 1987
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Aug 2018