Bickhram, Mahendra (CPSO#: 94497)

Current Status: Active Member as of 18 Oct 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Oct 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:St George's University of Grenada, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Milton Health Center
Suite 200
1225 Maple Avenue
Milton ON  L9T 0A5
Phone: (905) 693-6400
Fax: (905) 693-6405
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Bickhram Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 28 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Bickhram ( CPSO# 94497 )

Business Address:
Milton Health Centre
Suite 200
1225 Maple Avenue
Milton ON  L9T 0A5
Phone Number: (905) 693-6400

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 12 Oct 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MAHENDRA BICKHRAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BICKHRAM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 18 Oct 2010 to 09 Jan 2011
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 10 Jan 2011 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 17 Oct 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 18 Oct 2011 to 17 Oct 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 18 Oct 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Jan 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Oct 2012