Bielawska, Barbara (CPSO#: 93408)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Polish

Education:Queen's University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital-General Campus
Box 255
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: 613-737-8899 Ext. 73002
Fax: 613-737-8296
Electoral District: 07

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 08 Oct 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BARBARA BIELAWSKA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BIELAWSKA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 2015