Bielinski, Raphael (CPSO#: 92746)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Sep 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Sep 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Jagiellonian University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1111 ghislain street
Hawkesbury ON  K6A 3G5
Phone: 613 632 1111
Electoral District: 07

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hawkesbury & District General Hospital Hawkesbury

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 06 Mar 2009 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 03 Nov 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RAPHAEL BIELINSKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BIELINSKI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 07 Jun 2010 to 30 Jun 2010
Elective Trainee - Paediatric Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Jun 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Sep 2010