Bienenstock, Leonard (CPSO#: 91236)

Current Status: Active Member as of 20 Nov 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Nov 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Comprehensive Treatment Clinic
1154 Danforth
Toronto ON  M4J 1M3
Phone: 647-490-4008
Fax: 647-689-5890
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Anne Johnson Health Station
2398 Yonge St.
Toronto ON  M4P 2H4
Canada
Phone: 416-486-8666
Fax: 416-486-8660
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Simcoe Place Health Clinic
Unit C021D
200 Front Street West
Toronto ON  M5V 3K2
Canada
Phone: 416-599-9000
Fax: 416-599-9001
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

National Home Doctor Service
505 Consumer's Road
Unit# 901
North York ON  M2J 4V8
Canada
Phone: 416-631-3000
Fax: 416-631-0613
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

#A-890 Yonge St.
Toronto ON  M4W 3P4
Canada
Phone: 416-962-4444
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Sep 2015 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LEONARD BIENENSTOCK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BIENENSTOCK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 11 Jan 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 12 Jan 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 Aug 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Nov 2015