Biertho, Laurent Denis (CPSO#: 81653)

Current Status: Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 01 Sep 2006

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Sep 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Liege, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 06 Sep 2004
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

McMaster University, 07 Sep 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Apr 2006
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 06 Sep 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Sep 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Apr 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 May 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Sep 2006