Bilbily, Ghassan Fahmi Yacoub (CPSO#: 72897)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 Jul 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Aug 2002

Summary

Former Name: Yacoub, Ghassan Fahmi (used until: 09 Jan 2005 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Baghdad, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Maple Endoscopy
9100 Jane Street
Building A , Suite 105
Vaughan ON  L4K 0A4
Phone: (905) 482-3387
Fax: (905) 760-5587
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

North York Endoscopy
2 Champagne Dr
Unit B19
North York ON  M3J 2C5
Canada
Phone: (416) 645-5145
Fax: (416) 645-1401
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ghassan Bilbily Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 08 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Bilbily ( CPSO# 72897 )

Business Address:
North York Endoscopy
2 Champagne Drive
Unit B19
North York ON  M3J 2C5
Phone Number: (416) 645-5145

Business Address:
Suite 105
9100 Jane Street
Building A
Vaughan ON  L4K 0A4
Phone Number: (416) 471-0441

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 08 Jul 2002 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 26 Oct 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GHASSAN FAHMI YACOUB BILBILY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BILBILY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 08 Jul 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 09 Jul 1999 to 08 Jul 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 09 Jul 2000 to 08 Jul 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 09 Jul 2001 to 08 Jul 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 09 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 08 Jul 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 1998
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Aug 2002