Bilbily, Janan Fahmi Yacoub (CPSO#: 72898)

Current Status: Active Member as of 22 Dec 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Dec 2000

Summary

Former Name: Yacoub, Janan Fahmi (used until: 21 Dec 2000 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Baghdad, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Milner Health Centre
857 Milner Avenue
Scarborough ON  M1B 5N6
Phone: (416) 287-3611
Fax: (416) 287-6460
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

LAWRENCE HEALTH CENTRE
1801 LAWRENCE AVE. EAST
Unit 8
Toronto ON  M1R-2X9
Canada
Phone: 416 532 5325
Fax: 416 287 6460
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Janan Bilbily Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 28 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Bilbily ( CPSO# 106308)
Dr. J. Bilbily ( CPSO# 72898 )

Business Address:
1801 Lawrence Avenue East
Toronto ON  M1R 2X9
Phone Number: (416) 532-5325

Business Address:
Milner Health Centre
857 Milner Avenue
Scarborough ON  M1B 5N6
Phone Number: (416) 287-3611

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 07 Dec 2000 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JANAN FAHMI YACOUB BILBILY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BILBILY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 10 Nov 2000
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 31 Jan 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 22 Dec 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Dec 2000