Bilgasem, Solieman Ahmed H (CPSO#: 76910)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Jul 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Al Fateh, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 200A
65 Larch Street
Sudbury ON  P3E 1B8
Phone: (705) 673-1963
Fax: (705) 673-8676
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Solieman Bilgasem Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 05 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Bilgasem ( CPSO# 76910 )

Business Address:
Suite 200A
65 Larch Street
Sudbury ON  P3E 1B8
Phone Number: (705) 673-1963

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Health Sciences North Sudbury

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 30 Jun 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SOLIEMAN AHMED H BILGASEM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BILGASEM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Jul 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002