Billie, Christine Anne (CPSO#: 76275)

Current Status: Active Member as of 27 Jan 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jan 2004

Summary

Former Name: Bobaljik, Christine Anne (used until: 26 Sep 2007 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calgary, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa, Ontario
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 798-5555
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

The Courtyards on Eagleson
630 Eagleson Road
Kanata ON  K2M0N1
Canada
Phone: 613-878-0273
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Christine Billie Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 26 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Billie ( CPSO# 76275 )

Business Address:
630 Eagleson Road
Kanata ON  K2M 0N1
Phone Number: (613) 878-0273

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 798-5555

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa
Sioux Lookout,Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre Sioux Lookout

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 05 Dec 2003 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHRISTINE ANNE BILLIE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BILLIE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 22 Sep 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 23 Sep 2002 to 17 Nov 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Nov 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jan 2004