Bin Nasser, Ahmad Saleh A (CPSO#: 85493)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Oct 2008

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Oct 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Saud University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Aug 2006 to 31 Jul 2007
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Aug 2007 to 31 Jul 2008
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Aug 2008 to 31 Oct 2008
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Aug 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Oct 2008