BinKhamis, Shagran Mohammed I (CPSO#: 92749)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 28 Sep 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 28 Sep 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:King Saud University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 28 Sep 2012
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Sep 2012