Bindlish, Rajiv (CPSO#: 72693)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Aug 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Aug 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Oakville Eye Associates
Unit A2
2330 Wyecroft Road
Oakville ON  L6L 6M1
Phone: (905) 469-6666
Fax: (905) 469-3171
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rajiv Bindlish Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 12 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Bindlish ( CPSO# 72693 )

Business Address:
Oakville Eye Associates
2330 Wyecroft Road
Unit A2
Oakville ON  L6L 6M1
Phone Number: (905) 469-6666

Business Address:
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 0L8
Phone Number: (905) 845-2571

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington
Milton Site Halton Healthcare Services Milton
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 23 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RAJIV BINDLISH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BINDLISH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 29 Jun 1998 to 24 Jul 1998
Elective Trainee - Ophthalmology

McMaster University, 29 Mar 1999 to 09 Apr 1999
Elective Trainee - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 24 Jul 1998
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 29 Mar 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 09 Apr 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Aug 1999