Bingham, Katherine Dickinson (CPSO#: 84631)

Current Status: Active Member as of 06 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Jul 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Region of Peel - Public Health
7120 Hurontario Street
PO Box 667 RPO Streetsville
Mississauga ON  L5M 2C2
Phone: 905-791-7800
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Markham Stouffville Hospital
381 Church Street
PO Box 1800
Markham ON  L3P 7P3
Canada
Phone: 905-472-7373
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2008 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 22 Oct 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KATHERINE DICKINSON BINGHAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BINGHAM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Community Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Community Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Community Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 25 Sep 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Community Medicine

University of Toronto, 26 Sep 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Community Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 10 Nov 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Community Medicine

University of Toronto, 26 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Community Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 2009