Bir, Amnit Singh (CPSO#: 93844)

Current Status: Active Member as of 22 Aug 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Aug 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:Saba University School of Medicine, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 107
10095 Bramalea Road
Brampton ON L6S 0C9
Brampton ON  L6R 0K1
Phone: (905) 793-3311
Fax: (905) 793-3631
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Amnit Bir Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jun 27 2014


Corporation Name: Dr. Amnit Bir Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 30 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Bir ( CPSO# 93844 )

Business Address:
Unit 107
10095 Bramalea Road
Brampton ON  L6R 0K1
Phone Number: (905) 793-3311

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AMNIT SINGH BIR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BIR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 22 Sep 2010
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Aug 2012