Bir, Karen (CPSO#: 79825)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Sep 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 01 Sep 2010

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:American University of the Caribbean, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 604
790 Bay Street
Toronto ON  M5G 1N8
Phone: (416) 204-9200
Fax: (416) 413-9689
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 01 Sep 2010 CPSO Recognized Specialist
Rheumatology Effective: 01 Sep 2010 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 26 Sep 2003
PEAP - Resident - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 27 Sep 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Sep 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2004 to 30 Sep 2005
Clinical Fellow - Rheumatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Sep 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 17 Nov 2011
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 17 Nov 2011

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 17 Nov 2011 Active View Details [+]
                  Dr. Karen Bir may practise medicine independently in Rheumatology, only.