Bird, Jeffery Robert (CPSO#: 91133)

Current Status: Active Member as of 28 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Saskatchewan, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Real Time Medical
3rd Floor
7111 Syntex Dr
Mississauga ON  L5N 8C3
Electoral District: 05

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JEFFERY ROBERT BIRD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BIRD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 05 Aug 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

The University of Western Ontario, 06 Aug 2011 to 05 Aug 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

The University of Western Ontario, 06 Aug 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 05 Aug 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

The University of Western Ontario, 06 Aug 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2018